MD SB278 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain restrictions and requirements related to the authority of the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund to accept premiums on an installment payment basis for motor vehicle liability insurance policies; and authorizing the Fund to charge and collect, if approved by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner, reasonable installment fees or reasonable fees for late payment of premiums by policyholders.
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-4) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB377 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Fees
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 20 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 27 | 216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |