MD SB278 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Farms and Families Program in the Department of Agriculture; establishing that the purpose of the Program is to double the purchasing power of food-insecure Maryland residents with limited access to fresh fruits and vegetables and to increase revenue for farmers through redemption of specified benefits at Maryland farmers markets; establishing a Maryland Farms and Families Fund; requiring the Governor to include a $500,000 appropriation to the Fund each fiscal year subject to the limitations of the State budget; etc.
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Act
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {767877/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Farmland
Food
Food Stamps
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Farmland
Food
Food Stamps
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations