MD SB272 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB155
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Director of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to issue certain fraternal organizations a license for not more than a certain number of instant ticket lottery machines for the sale of certain instant lottery tickets under certain circumstances; and providing for the distribution of the proceeds from certain lottery machine ticket sales by a fraternal organization.
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB224 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-13 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB155 (Carry Over) 2022-03-31 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB155 (Carry Over) 2022-03-31 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Domestic Violence
Gaming
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Nonprofit Organizations
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Women
Gaming
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Nonprofit Organizations
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0272?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0272f.pdf |