MD SB263 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a food service facility that offers children's meals to offer certain water, milk or a nondairy milk alternative, or a beverage consisting of 8 ounces or less of 100% fruit or vegetable juice combined with water or sparkling water, with no added natural or artificial sweeteners, as the default beverages included with the meal.
Title
Health - Food Service Facilities - Beverage Options With Children's Meals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Floor Amendment {953728/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment {963727/1 Withdrawn |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {963727/1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB661 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 21 | 330.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |