MD SB263 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the charter or bylaws of a corporation may require that any internal corporate claim be brought only in certain specified courts; repealing the authority of certain corporations to effect a certain reverse stock split; altering the manner in which a corporation may allow stockholders to participate in a certain meeting; authorizing a certain meeting of the stockholders to be held partially or solely by means of remote communication; etc.
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-10) |
2021-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {873899/1 Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB781 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 779
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Courts
Investments
Jurisdiction
Liability
meetings
Real Estate
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Securities
Voting
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Courts
Investments
Jurisdiction
Liability
meetings
Real Estate
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Securities
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 502.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 606.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 3 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 3 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 8 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 8 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 8 | 601.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |