MD SB260 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from issuing a summons if the defendant is charged with a specified crime of violence; prohibiting a commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant charged with committing a crime while the defendant was released on bail or personal recognizance for a pending prior criminal charge; and prohibiting a commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant charged with committing a crime while on parole.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Arrests
Bail
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Summonses
Violence
Bail
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Summonses
Violence