MD SB260 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account in the Transportation Authority Fund; specifying the purpose of the Account; establishing the composition of the Account; providing for the use of funds in the Account; and providing for the transfer of funds in the Transportation Authority Fund to the Account under specified circumstances.
Title
Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation & Finance |
Subjects
Bridges and Tunnels
Cecil County
Construction
Fees
Harford County
Highways
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Cecil County
Construction
Fees
Harford County
Highways
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0260.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0260f.pdf |