MD SB260 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property leased to a nonprofit charter school and used exclusively for primary or secondary educational purposes; authorizing a partial property tax credit if only a part of real property is leased to a nonprofit charter school in Anne Arundel County; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Nonprofit Charter Schools - Property Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn | |
2011-02-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Charters
Leases and Rent
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Tax Credits
Charters
Leases and Rent
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Tax Credits