MD SB26 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB173
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (109-21)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (109-21)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the language of a provision of law requiring the expungement of certain records maintained by the State or a political subdivision of the State relating to the charging of certain offenses under certain circumstances.
Title
Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-21) |
2022-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733524/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-04-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB26 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (109-21)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 105.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |