MD SB258 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the credential reappointment process for physician staff included in certain minimum standards for hospitals licensed in the State be conducted in accordance with standards of the accreditation body that accredits a hospital, rather than every 2 years.
Title
Hospital Credentialing - Reappointment Process for Physician Staff - Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB633 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Subjects
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Licenses
Physicians
Work, Labor, and Employment
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Licenses
Physicians
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |