MD SB257 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $3,000,000 to $6,000,000 the maximum amount that may be transferred, in the State budget or through a specified budget amendment process, to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund from funds that are distributed to Program Open Space; and requiring that, if more than $3,000,000 is transferred to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Fund under the Act, the amount exceeding $3,000,000 shall be provided from the State's share of funds.
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {329935/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Historical Matters
Natural Resources - Generally
Operating Budget
Program Open Space
Revenue and Taxes
Budgets
Historical Matters
Natural Resources - Generally
Operating Budget
Program Open Space
Revenue and Taxes