MD SB255 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Senators Hester, Washington, and Lee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain museums to claim title to certain property in the possession of the museum; requiring a museum, before taking title to certain property, to provide notice by certified mail; authorizing a museum, under certain circumstances, to provide notice by publication; requiring a lender to assert ownership of certain property within 60 days of a certain notice; authorizing, under certain circumstances, a museum to apply certain conservation measures to certain property; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateSenators Hester, Washington, and Lee
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-04-08HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08HouseFloor Amendment {453626/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
2019-04-08HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {593899/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {938873/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-30SenateHearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0255&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0255f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0255t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0255_93887301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0255_45362601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0255_59389901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0255.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0255_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0526.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0255_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1545.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback