MD SB254 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "charitable contribution" to exclude an authorization for or a discount on the use of certain services or materials, equipment, or facilities for purposes of provisions of law regulating charitable organizations and charitable representatives; and authorizing the Maryland Secretary of State to accept certain documentation in place of an audit or a review in connection with a charitable organization's registration statement.
Title
Business Regulation - Charitable Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {273528/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB72 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Subjects
Advertising
Business Regulation
Commerce and Business
Communications
Equipment
Gifts
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
Business Regulation
Commerce and Business
Communications
Equipment
Gifts
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 6 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |