MD SB253 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a register of wills to accept certain documents filed electronically through a system established by the register of wills; and prohibiting a register of wills from refusing to accept a document based on the manner in which it was signed.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB244 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |