MD SB252 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight to hold at least two public hearings on workplace bullying in State agencies before the start of the 2015 regular legislative session; authorizing the Joint Committee to accept testimony on specified subjects at a public hearing held under the Act; requiring the Joint Committee to notify each State agency of the time and location of any public hearing at least 3 weeks before the scheduled date of the hearing; etc.
Title
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Public Hearings on Workplace Bullying in State Agencies
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Sen. Christopher Shank [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {357677/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Harassment
Hearings
Notices
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Harassment
Hearings
Notices
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment