MD SB251 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for the elimination of certain paper licenses for collection agencies, credit services, lenders, installment lenders, mortgage lenders, mortgage loan originators, sales finance companies, check cashing services, money transmission businesses, and debt management services; providing for the licensing of certain persons for certain activities through the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry (NMLS); requiring that certain licenses provided for through NMLS include certain information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101
2021-03-31SenateReturned Passed
2021-03-30HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-03-30HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2021-03-16HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-18HouseReferred Economic Matters
2021-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-02-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-10SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-02-09SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-01-18SenateHearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-18SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-09-22SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation7101(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7305(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7306.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7307(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law141901(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law141903(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11201(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11208(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11209.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11210(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11211(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11301(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11302(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11303(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11304(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11401(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11408(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11410(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11411(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11412(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11501(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11505(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11512(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11512.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11514(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11601(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11603(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11603.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11609(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12101(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12110(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12110.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12112(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12113(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12401(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12410(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12415(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12422(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12901(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12911(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12913(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12915(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12925(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback