MD SB251 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to require, on or before July 1, 2016, specified certificate holders applying for renewal of a certificate as a school counselor to have obtained, by a method determined by the Board, specified knowledge and skills required to understand and respond to the social, emotional, and personal development of students; etc.
Title
Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - School Counselors - Certification Renewal Requirement (Lauryn's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {764638/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Education
Job Training
Licenses
Mental Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Students
Substance Abuse
Teachers
Violence
Counselors
Education
Job Training
Licenses
Mental Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Students
Substance Abuse
Teachers
Violence