MD SB249 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB378
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Baltimore City to enact and enforce local laws regulating the sale and distribution of cigarettes, other tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices, subject to certain exceptions.
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB378 (Carry Over) 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
HB442 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
HB442 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Baltimore City
Business Regulation
Licenses
Public Officials
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Smoking and Vaping
Tobacco and Nicotine
Business Regulation
Licenses
Public Officials
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Smoking and Vaping
Tobacco and Nicotine
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 16 | 308.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 7 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |