MD SB248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class D beer and wine license in Harford County; repealing the prohibition on a Class D beer and wine license in Harford County; authorizing the license holder to sell beer and wine, at retail, at the licensed premises for on-premises consumption; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue not more than five Class D licenses to the same person; requiring the license holder to provide prepackaged snack food; providing an annual license fee of $1,000; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB144 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Harford County
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Harford County
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0248?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0248f.pdf |