MD SB248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from engaging in certain conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; exempting certain conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act of imprisonment for up to 18 months or a fine of up to $5,000 or both; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26SenateFloor Amendment {593625/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFloor Amendment {253521/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback