MD SB243 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt any migratory game birds on Sundays during the open season on private property or public land designated for hunting.
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |