MD SB242 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the newborn screening program in the Maryland Department of Health to require testing for each condition listed by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services' Recommended Uniform Screening Panel, subject to the approval of the State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders and the Secretary of Health; and establishing certain requirements related to the approval or disapproval of the inclusion of a condition and the implementation of testing for a condition in the system for newborn screening.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - System for Newborn Screening - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-2) |
2022-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503022/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB109 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Data
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Pregnancy
Public Health
Records
Data
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Pregnancy
Public Health
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |