MD SB241 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide health insurance benefits under specified insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for specified equipment and supplies used for the treatment of ostomies; providing that the required coverage may be subject to specified deductibles and coinsurance; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans subject to the Act that are issued, delivered or renewed on or after October 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - Required
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {136386/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Equipment
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Records
Rules and Regulations
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Records
Rules and Regulations