MD SB235 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB511
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing individuals who have a permanent physical disability, including blindness to deduct $1,000 as a personal exemption under the Maryland income tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB511 (Carry Over) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0235?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0235f.pdf |