MD SB234 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an officer, an employee, an agent, or a contractor of the State or a political subdivision to deny inspection by a federal agency seeking access for certain immigration enforcement matters of the part of a public record that contains personal information or a certain photographic image unless a warrant is provided; requiring law enforcement agencies operating certain databases to require certain individuals accessing the databases to provide certain information; requiring a certain annual report to the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2021-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {748276/1 Adopted
2021-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB23 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-09 - Third Reading Passed (32-14)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions4320(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4320.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3523(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback