MD SB231 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, unless the child's family has requested that the child be removed, that a child on the registry for the Autism Waiver remain on the registry if the child's family relocates out of the State for military service.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Autism Waiver - Military Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {503029/1 Adopted |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB726 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 151 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |