MD SB230 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a health care provider to disclose a certain medical record in accordance with compulsory process not later than 30 days after receiving certain documentation and certain fees; authorizing a health care provider, on a showing of good cause, to request up to 30 additional days beyond the date by which disclosure is required to disclose a medical record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of Medical Records - Compulsory Process - Timeline

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (136-1)
2018-04-06HouseSpecial Order until 4/7 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted
2018-04-06HouseMotion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Barkley) Rejected
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {147070/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-14SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-19SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback