MD SB228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB588
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "high performance building" to include certain schools and public safety buildings; altering the application of certain high performance building requirements to apply to capital projects for which more than 25% of the funding for the acquisition, construction, or renovation of the project is from State funds; repealing a requirement that the Maryland Green Building Council develop guidelines for new public school buildings to achieve a certain rating without requiring a certain certification; etc.
Title
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings - Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB228 (Carry Over) 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
HB86 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-11 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
HB86 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-11 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Capital Budgets
Environmental Health
Mass Transit
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Rural Areas
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Weights and Measures
Environmental Health
Mass Transit
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Rural Areas
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3 | 602.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0228?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0228f.pdf |