MD SB228 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the eligibility criteria for the cybersecurity investment incentive tax credit to provide the credit to a qualified investor in a qualified Maryland cybersecurity company rather than providing the credit to the company; authorizing certain buyers of certain technology to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain costs; providing that the credit may not exceed $2,000,000 in taxable year 2018 and $4,000,000 in taxable year 2019; requiring the Secretary of Commerce to award 25% of the credits to certain buyers; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cybersecurity Incentive Tax Credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-23) (Y: 112 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 578
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (111-23)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {935666/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-28HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {629236/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-01-31SenateHearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
2018-01-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0228&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0228f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0228t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0228e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_578_sb0228e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0228_62923601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0228_93566601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0228.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0228_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0692.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0228_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1187.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1272.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/ag_letters/sb0228.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback