MD SB228 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the election of a president, secretary, and treasurer of the State Board of Pharmacy be from among the pharmacist members of the Board.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Election of Officers
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2014-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |