MD SB227 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Charlotte Hall Veterans Home to accept specified gifts and grants for use at the Home; providing for the uses and administration of the gifts and grants accepted for use at the Home; and requiring the Director of the Veterans Home Program and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to report each year on the status of the gifts and grants accepted for use at the Home.
Title
Charlotte Hall Veterans Home - Gifts and Grants - Authority to Accept and Spend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-20 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |