MD SB226 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "qualified Maryland biotechnology company" to extend a specified time period from a specified date that an active business may claim the biotechnology tax credit; altering the definition of "biotechnology company" to include a company that will be primarily engaged in, or within 2 months will be primarily engaged in, specified activities; providing for the revocation of a specified tax credit certificate and the recapture of the tax credit under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-12) (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-12) (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-12) |
2017-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {393423/1 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {185560/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {359635/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |