MD SB223 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making the Dorchester County transfer tax provisions permanent by repealing the sunset provision.
Title
Dorchester County - County Transfer Tax - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (130-9) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (42-4) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |