MD SB222 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions requiring certain courts exercising criminal jurisdiction in certain cases involving a child to order the child to be held in a secure juvenile facility pending a certain determination; requiring a certain child to be held in a secure juvenile facility and prohibiting the child from having sight or sound contact with adult inmates while the child is awaiting trial; requiring, rather than authorizing, certain courts to order that a certain study of a child be made under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m. |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Correctional Institutions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
defendants
District Courts
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Prisoners
Correctional Institutions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
defendants
District Courts
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Prisoners
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 4 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 4 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 4 | 202.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |