MD SB22 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB254

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an individual from engaging in the business of inspecting an on-site sewage disposal system unless the person holds a valid on-site wastewater property transfer inspection license issued by the Department of the Environment on or after July 1, 2022; requiring the Department to adopt regulations by January 1, 2022; providing an administrative penalty of up to $10,000 for a violation of the Act; providing that each inspection knowingly conducted without a valid license constitutes a separate violation of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Floor Amendment 603226/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 89 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-1)
2021-04-08SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (111-27)
2021-04-08HouseFloor Amendment {603226/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (47-89)
2021-04-06HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
2021-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05HouseFloor Committee Amendment {893723/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-25HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2021-02-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {974531/1 Adopted
2021-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-12-29SenateHearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-08-25SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB407 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
SB254 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment9217.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9217.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0022?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0022f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0022t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0022e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0022_97453101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0022_89372301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0022_60322601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0022_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0022_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0259.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1205.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1206.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1063.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback