MD SB218 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB638

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income credit to allow certain residents to claim the credit; allowing certain taxpayers with federal adjusted gross income for the taxable year that is $6,000 or less to claim a credit against the State income tax for each qualified child in an amount equal to $500; allowing certain taxpayers to claim a refund in the amount of any excess credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2023; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Child Tax Credit and Expansion of the Earned Income Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Floor Amendment 743420/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (Y: 53 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Floor Amendment 233929/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (Y: 46 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Floor Amendment 673221/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 46 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - Floor Amendment 423925/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 833323/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
2021-02-26SenateReturned Passed
2021-02-26HouseThird Reading Passed (91-44)
2021-02-26HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (46-88)
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {423925/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (47-92)
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {743420/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (53-86)
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {233929/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (46-92)
2021-02-25HouseSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-25HouseFavorable Adopted
2021-02-24HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2021-02-19HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-19HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-02-19SenateThird Reading Passed (32-15)
2021-02-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-17SenateFloor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (46-88)
2021-02-17SenateFloor Amendment {423925/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (47-92)
2021-02-17SenateCommittee Amendment {459931/1 Adopted
2021-02-17SenateFavorable with Amendments
2021-02-16SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2021-02-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {459931/1
2021-02-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-01-18SenateHearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-18SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-12SenateHearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-12SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-22SenateHearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2020-08-21SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB143 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
SB638 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10704(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10751(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0218?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0218f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0218t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_40_sb0218t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0218_45993101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0218_83332301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0218_42392501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0218_67322101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0218_23392901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0218_74342001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0228.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0229.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0249.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0228.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0229.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0226.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0227.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0230.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback