MD SB214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of Allegany County and of a municipal corporation in Allegany County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property owned by the Cumberland Economic Development Corporation; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-02-12SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-07SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/05 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback