MD SB214 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters related to the monitoring of guardians of vulnerable adults; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2018; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abuse
Committees and Commissions
Elderly
Estates and Trusts
Family Law
Fraud
Legislative Services, Department of
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Sunset
Vulnerable Adults
Committees and Commissions
Elderly
Estates and Trusts
Family Law
Fraud
Legislative Services, Department of
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Sunset
Vulnerable Adults