MD SB213 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 539
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 539
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a certain person may withhold the address or telephone number of a certain victim, victim's representative, or witness before a certain trial or adjudicatory hearing to apply to felonies or domestically related crimes or delinquent acts instead of only felonies or crimes that would be a felony if committed by an adult.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 539 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {508877/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB76 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-09 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Domestic Violence
Hearings
Privacy
Trials
Victims
Witnesses
Criminal Law - Procedure
Domestic Violence
Hearings
Privacy
Trials
Victims
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |