MD SB213 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of the appropriation, beginning in fiscal year 2021, that the Governor is required to include in the annual budget bill for the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund from $1,000,000 to $3,000,000; and altering the termination date for certain provisions of law relating to the Fund.
Title
Natural Resources – State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Mandatory Funding and Termination Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {214036/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Environmental Matters
Governor
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Operating Budget
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Shore Erosion
Sports and Recreation
Sunset
Water
Weeds
Budgets
Environmental Matters
Governor
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Operating Budget
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Shore Erosion
Sports and Recreation
Sunset
Water
Weeds