MD SB210 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the restriction on a holder of a Class 8 farm brewery license selling or serving only specified types of food; and allowing the holder to sell and serve any food if the holder is licensed to operate a food establishment, subject to specified requirements.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Zucker [D] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Sen. Wayne Norman [R] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903290/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994234/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |