MD SB210 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a school bus used to transport public school students from any toll, fee, or other charge for the use of the Intercounty Connector.
Title
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bridges and Tunnels
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Fees
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
School Buses
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Bridges and Tunnels
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Fees
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
School Buses
Transportation
Transportation - Highways