MD SB21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Third Reading Failed (22-25)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adding the Elevator Safety Review Board to the list of occupational boards that contribute to the State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund; repealing the requirement that certain fees be paid into the Elevator Safety Review Board Fund; authorizing the Board to set by regulation reasonable fees based on certain calculations; requiring the Board to publish a schedule of fees and to pay certain fees to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to distribute the fees to the State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Board's Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateThird Reading Failed (22-25)
2019-01-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-01-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-01-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-10-25SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback