MD SB208 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-21 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-21 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act; establishing rights and obligations of specified intended parents who use gamete or embryo donors to conceive a child through collaborative reproduction; establishing rights of a child conceived through collaborative reproduction; establishing that a gamete or an embryo donor is not a parent of a child conceived through collaborative reproduction under specified circumstances; requiring a gestational carrier agreement to be approved by a circuit judge prior to the embryo transfer; etc.
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-2) (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-2) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {678076/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {678076/1 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abortion
Adoption
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Attorneys
Child Custody
Circuit Courts
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Divorce
Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Fees
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Marriage
Mental Health
Minors
Paternity
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Support of Dependents
Surrogate Parenting
Vital Records
Women
Adoption
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Attorneys
Child Custody
Circuit Courts
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Divorce
Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Fees
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Marriage
Mental Health
Minors
Paternity
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Support of Dependents
Surrogate Parenting
Vital Records
Women