MD SB206 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the eligibility for the filing of a certain motion to vacate judgment if the person's participation in the offense was a direct result of being a victim of human trafficking; requiring that a certain motion be served on a certain State's Attorney; requiring that a certain motion be mailed to a victim or victim's representative at a certain address if the qualifying offense occurred within 5 years before the filing of the motion; requiring the court to take certain factors into consideration when making a certain finding; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-02-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {178674/1 Adopted
2020-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-01-17SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB242 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure10105(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure8302(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback