MD SB205 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the scope of a certain provision prohibiting the retail delivery to a purchaser of alcoholic beverages under certain circumstances; providing that certain authorization for the holders of certain licenses to sell alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption in a certain manner applies only in a jurisdiction where the local licensing board had adopted certain regulations; authorizing the holders of certain licenses to sell certain alcoholic beverages in sealed containers for off-premises consumption or delivery; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (134-2)
2021-04-12HouseConference Committee Report {413220/1 Adopted
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2021-04-12SenateConference Committee Report {413220/1 Adopted
2021-04-05SenateHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D.E. Davis, T. Branch and C. Watson)
2021-04-05SenateHouse Refuses Recede
2021-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D.E. Davis, T. Branch and C. Watson)
2021-04-05HouseHouse Refuses Recede
2021-04-05HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Simonaire, Pinsky and Washington)
2021-04-05HouseSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-05HouseSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-04-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Simonaire, Pinsky and Washington)
2021-04-02SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-02SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (131-2)
2021-03-31HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments {443298/1 Adopted
2021-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-03-22HouseReferred Economic Matters
2021-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-1)
2021-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {323428/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
2021-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {133425/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected
2021-03-19SenateMotion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
2021-03-19SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
2021-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {963920/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected
2021-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {994338/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {994338/1
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-12SenateHearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-11-01SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB12 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages41107(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages4507(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0205?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0205f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0205t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0205e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_141_sb0205e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0205_99433801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0205_96392001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0205_13342501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0205_32342801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0205_44329801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0205_41322001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0205_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0205_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0655.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0939.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1403.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1143.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback