MD SB205 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a driver who has been given a visual or audible signal to stop by a police officer in a vehicle that is not an appropriately marked police vehicle but is displaying an activated flashing blue or red and blue light from attempting to elude the police officer; creating an exception under the Act to allow a driver to proceed directly to a police station or any other lighted public location before stopping; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Fleeing or Eluding Police
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-22 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {918971/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road