MD SB204 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the Maryland Department of Health establish training and staffing requirements for Alzheimer's special care units in assisted living programs to include the number of dementia-specific training hours needed, determine the topic content for
dementia-specific training, and require staff numbers sufficient to meet the need of residents in special care units; and requiring the Department to convene certain stakeholders to make revisions to certain regulations and adopt certain regulations by December 1, 2022.
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Requirements for Alzheimer's Special Care Units and Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {536981/1 Adopted |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {157779/1 Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB416 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Subjects
Assisted Living
Continuing Education
Disabilities
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Job Training
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Continuing Education
Disabilities
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Job Training
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |