MD SB204 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "sexual act" to include an act in which a part of an individual's body is used to penetrate specified body parts of another individual; and altering the definition of "sexual contact".
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definitions
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-03-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |