MD SB203 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions relating to certain orders granting custody and guardianship of a child in need of assistance to a relative or nonrelative; and altering provisions relating to review hearings to review the permanency plan for a certain child in an out-of-home placement.
Title
Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Child Care
Child Custody
Court Orders
Family Law
Foster Care
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Parents and Guardians
Child Custody
Court Orders
Family Law
Foster Care
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Parents and Guardians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 819.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 823 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |